Global Patent Index - EP 1079359 A2

EP 1079359 A2 2001-02-28 - Advertising column

Title (en)

Advertising column

Title (de)

Säulenartiger Werbeträger

Title (fr)

Colonne d'affichage

Publication

EP 1079359 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890236 A

Priority

  • AT 56599 U
  • AT 49200 U

Abstract (en)

The column (1) has several concave surfaces to hold advertisements, placards, etc., are arranged around a central column as tall as the advertisement supports. The column may be rotatably fixed on a base plate. The surfaces are sufficiently stiff to form a self-supporting structure. The lower area of the column may have feet arranged inside a pedestal. Outwardly projecting rings (2,3) may be arranged at the top and bottom of the column.

Abstract (de)

Ein säulenförmiger Werbeträger besteht aus konkav geformten Feldern (7,107), die als Träger für Werbemitteilungen, wie Plakate, dienen. Die Felder (7,107) sind im Bereich ihrer lotrechten Ränder miteinander verbunden. Am Werbeträger sind unten und oben nach außen abstehende Ringe (2,3,102,103) vorgesehen, zwischen denen die Felder (7,107) angeordnet sind. Die Krümmungsachsen der konkaven Blechfelder (7,107) sind parallel zur Längsachse des Werbeträgers ausgerichtet. So ergibt sich eine gute Stabilität des säulenförmigen Werbeträgers und trotz großer für Werbung zur Verfügung stehenden Fläche ein schlanker optischer Gesamteindruck. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079359 A2 20010228; EP 1079359 A3 20011017

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI