Global Patent Index - EP 1079363 A2

EP 1079363 A2 2001-02-28 - Driving method for liquid crystal device

Title (en)

Driving method for liquid crystal device

Title (de)

Treiberverfahren für eine Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande d'un panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides

Publication

EP 1079363 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307292 A

Priority

  • JP 23767699 A
  • JP 2000253308 A

Abstract (en)

A driving method for a liquid crystal device of the type comprising a pair of oppositely disposed substrates each provided with an electrode, a chiral smectic liquid crystal disposed between the substrates to form a plurality of pixels and to be placed in a monostable state under no voltage application, and a plurality of active elements each of which is provided to an associated pixel and is connected with an associated electrode so as to effect a matrix drive of the liquid crystal device includes a step of driving the liquid crystal device so that the liquid crystal is tilted from the monostable state to provide a maximum tilt angle in actual drive smaller than a saturation tilt angle. The drive method is effective in suppressing burning or alignment state change of the chiral smectic liquid crystal, thus improving display characteristics. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3651 (2013.01); G09G 2320/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079363 A2 20010228; EP 1079363 A3 20020327; JP 2001133751 A 20010518; KR 20010021414 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040303

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI