Global Patent Index - EP 1079412 A2

EP 1079412 A2 2001-02-28 - Television tube

Title (en)

Television tube

Title (de)

Fernsehröhre

Title (fr)

Tube de télévision

Publication

EP 1079412 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117079 A

Priority

DE 19939794 A

Abstract (en)

The front face (1.1) of the screen, facing the viewer, has four edges in the form of a rectangle. At least one of the four edges follows, at least approximately, a straight line. AT least one of the edges is curved convexly and has a radius of curvature that is at least five times the diagonal dimension of the screen. An Independent claim is included for a throat for a television tube, and for a television tube.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fernsehröhre mit einem Bildschirm und einem Trichter. Gemäß der Erfindung hat wenigstens die Frontfläche des Bildschirmes die Form eines geometrischen Rechteckes oder wenigstens annähernd eine solche Form. Der Trichter hat im Anschlußbereich eine entsprechende Kontur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/861 (2013.01); H01J 2229/8616 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079412 A2 20010228; EP 1079412 A3 20021127; JP 2001093444 A 20010406; US 6570316 B1 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLAS

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI