Global Patent Index - EP 1079472 A1

EP 1079472 A1 2001-02-28 - Multipolar electrical plug device

Title (en)

Multipolar electrical plug device

Title (de)

Mehrpolige elektrische Steckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique multipolaire

Publication

EP 1079472 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117764 A

Priority

DE 19939994 A

Abstract (en)

The connector (11) includes a plug (12) and a counter connector (13). When the plug is coupled to the counter connector, an intermediate contact space (36) is created, which is sealed by a first sealing member (27) and a radial sealing member (31). The size of the contact space decreases along the coupling. The pressure in the contact space can be equalized by an equalizing element (37) on the plug or counter connector.

Abstract (de)

Eine mehrpolige elektrische Steckvorrichtung (11) ist so auszuführen, daß beim Schließen der Steckvorrichtung (11) die Steckkräfte gering sind. Die Steckvorrichtung (11) weist einen Steckverbinder (12) und einen Gegenstecker (13) auf. Beim lösbaren Koppeln des Steckverbinders (12) mit dem Gegenstecker (13) entsteht ein zwischenliegender Kontaktraum (36), der über ein erstes Dichtelement (27) und über ein als Radialdichtung ausgebildetes zweites Dichtelement (31) abgedichtet ist. Die Größe des Kontaktraums (36) nimmt bei fortschreitender Kopplung ab. Der Kontaktraum (36) ist über ein Ausgleichselement (37) am Steckverbinder (12) oder Gegenstecker (13) druckausgleichbar. Die Steckvorrichtung (11) ist vorzugsweise für den Einsatz in der Automobilindustrie vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629; H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5208 (2013.01); H01R 13/629 (2013.01); H01R 13/5219 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079472 A1 20010228; EP 1079472 B1 20080305; DE 19939994 A1 20010301; DE 50015010 D1 20080417

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015010

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2008-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015010 P 20080417

2008-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070205

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI