Global Patent Index - EP 1079556 A2

EP 1079556 A2 2001-02-28 - Method for retrieving radiotext in a broadcast receiver and broadcast receiver comprising an interface for connection with a data bus

Title (en)

Method for retrieving radiotext in a broadcast receiver and broadcast receiver comprising an interface for connection with a data bus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Abfrage von Radiotext in einem Rundfunkempfänger und Rundfunkempfänger mit einer Schnittstelle zu einem Datenbus

Title (fr)

Méthode pour récupérer dans un récepteur de radiodiffusion les données de texte transmises avec la transmission radiophonique ainsi que récepteur comportant une interface vers un bus de données

Publication

EP 1079556 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115383 A

Priority

DE 19940266 A

Abstract (en)

Data are transmitted between a receiver (1) and an operating and display unit (2) of the radio receiver via a line (3) such as a bus. Radio text contained in received radio signals is decoded in the receiver (1). The decoded radio text is buffered and requested by a software element in the operating and display unit and/or in other components connected to the bus. The software element is informed that the radio text has been completely decoded and buffered. An Independent claim is included for a radio broadcast receiver.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Abfrage von Radiotext in einem Rundfunkempfänger bzw. ein Rundfunkempfänger mit einer Leitung (3) vorgeschlagen, das bzw. der dazu dient, Radiotext aus empfangenen Rundfunksignalen zu ermitteln, und es dem Benutzer ermöglicht, Radiotext abrufen zu können. Der Rundfunkempfänger umfaßt eine Empfangsvorrichtung (1) und eine Bedien- und Darstellungseinrichtung (2) die mittels einer Leitung (3) verbunden sind. In der Empfangsvorrichtung (1) wird der Radiotext aus den empfangenen Rundfunksignalen ermittelt, decodiert und zwischengespeichert und auf Anfrage durch ein Softwareelement der Bedien- und Darstellungseinrichtung über die Leitung (3) abgerufen und von dem Softwareelement in der Bedien- und Darstellungseinrichtung (2) dargestellt. Das Softwareelement bestimmt anhand der Länge des Radiotexts und der Größe der Anzeige der Bedien- und Darstellungseinrichtung, welche Radiotextlänge dargestellt werden soll oder ob Radiotext abgerufen werden soll oder ob neuer Radiotext decodiert werden soll. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04H 60/27 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/27 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079556 A2 20010228; EP 1079556 A3 20060104; DE 19940266 A1 20010322; JP 2001094451 A 20010406

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0040000000

- Effective date: 20140723

2014-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-07-23 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0040000000

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071107

2006-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060704

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-01-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI