Global Patent Index - EP 1079574 A8

EP 1079574 A8 2001-05-02 - Digital VSB modulator

Title (en)

Digital VSB modulator

Title (de)

Digitaler Restseitenbandmodulator

Title (fr)

Modulateur numérique à bande latérale résiduelle

Publication

EP 1079574 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00117935 A

Priority

US 38223199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1079574A2] A digital method and apparatus modulates a stream of digitized samples from a source, (202) by a digital representation of a carrier (804) to provide, for example, a 6 MHz bandwidth television signal selectively centered either at 63 MHz (Channel 3), 69 MHz (Channel 4) or 5.38 MHz IF (baseband). More particularly the method includes first resampling (800) the stream of digitized samples and then modulating (802) the resampled stream of samples with a repeating short sequence of complex values (804), which complex values represent a digitized exponential carrier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03C 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 27/02 (2006.01); H04L 27/04 (2006.01); H04N 7/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079574 A2 20010228; EP 1079574 A3 20040107; EP 1079574 A8 20010502; EP 1079574 B1 20061129; BR 0003751 A 20010403; BR PI0003751 B1 20150811; CN 1229950 C 20051130; CN 1285686 A 20010228; CN 1708038 A 20051214; CN 1708038 B 20100428; DE 60032075 D1 20070111; DE 60032075 T2 20070606; JP 2001111638 A 20010420; JP 4562105 B2 20101013; KR 100650129 B1 20061124; KR 20010021374 A 20010315; MX PA00008270 A 20020722; MY 120854 A 20051130; TW 516293 B 20030101; US 6466277 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160805

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070312

2007-02-14 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070123

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032075 P 20070111

2006-12-27 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: NOTIFICATION HAS BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE PUBLICATION LANGUAGE IS ACTUALLY ENGLISH

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061129

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 27/02 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 5/44 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 14/04 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 7/22 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 29/10 B

2001-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIGITAL VSB MODULATOR

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI