Global Patent Index - EP 1079744 A1

EP 1079744 A1 2001-03-07 - APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF LASER SURGERY OF HARD TISSUES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF LASER SURGERY OF HARD TISSUES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE LASERCHIRURGIE VON HARTEN GEWEBEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER UNE CHIRURGIE AU LASER SUR DES TISSUS DURS

Publication

EP 1079744 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919946 A

Priority

  • US 9908751 W
  • US 6954798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955243A1] An apparatus (20) for ablating a target site (22) of a hard biological tissue (24), such as enamel, dentine and bone tissue including a first radiation source (26) activatable of producing a first output (28) having a wavelength of between 1.5 and 6.5 microns; a second radiation source (27) activatable of producing a second output (30) having a wavelength of between 9.0 and 10.6 microns; a delivering arrangement (32) for effecting coaxialy of the first (28), and second (30) outputs and for concurrently delivering the outputs to the target site (22); wherein the first (28) and the second (30) outputs are selected such that the concurrent delivery of the first (28), and second (30) outputs to the target site (22) ablates the hard tissue (24) at the target site (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 19/00 (2006.01); A61C 1/00 (2006.01); A61B 18/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61C 1/0046 (2013.01); A61B 2018/207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955243 A1 19991104; AU 3754699 A 19991116; AU 742054 B2 20011213; CA 2331113 A1 19991104; EP 1079744 A1 20010307; EP 1079744 A4 20060628; IL 139350 D0 20011125

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070530

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061017

2006-06-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61B 17/36 00000000AFI19991109BHEP

2006-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61B 19/00 20060101ALI20060524BHEP

2006-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61C 1/00 20060101ALI20060524BHEP

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPUSDENT LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20001123