Global patent index - EP 1079775 A1

EP 1079775 A1 2001-03-07 - OPHTHALMOLOGIC DEVICE FOR LASER THERAPY

Title (en)

OPHTHALMOLOGIC DEVICE FOR LASER THERAPY

Title (de)

OPTHALMOLOGISCHES GERÄT ZUR LASERTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR OPHTALMOLOGIE AU LASER

Publication

EP 1079775 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99973776 A

Priority

  • RU 9900029 W
  • RU 98101927 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939669A1] The present invention may be used in the laser stimulation of the ciliary muscle for improving the adaptation capacity of the eye, for increasing the visual capacity, for reducing discomfort during the therapy process and for applying a combined action using a laser beam, i.e. a transscleral action on the ciliary body and on the central region of the retina. The device of the present invention comprises an optical unit (1) including a plurality of laser emitters (2) with shaping optics (3) and a local reducer (4) of the field of vision which is made in the shape of a diaphragm and defines a vision channel (5) representing the direction in which the patient is looking. The diaphragm (4) is arranged on a same axis (6) together with the inlet aperture (7). The optical unit (1) may further comprise a visible laser-beam source (8) which is optically connected through a semi-transparent mirror (9) to the vision channel (5) so as to apply an action on the central region of the retina. The transmission ratio of the mirror (9) is selected so that the patient is not prevented from observing a distant object through the outlet aperture (10) of the unit (1). It is further possible to include a diffused dispersion structure (11) allowing the patient to observe a speckle diagram formed by the laser beam emitted from the source (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/20 (2006.01); A61F 9/00 (2006.01); A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61N 5/06 (2006.01); A61N 5/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/008 (2013.01); A61N 5/0613 (2013.01); A61F 2009/00863 (2013.01); A61F 2009/00868 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939669 A1 19990812; AU 2645599 A 19990823; CA 2322525 A1 19990812; CA 2322525 C 20090929; CN 1198545 C 20050427; CN 1290155 A 20010404; EP 1079775 A1 20010307; EP 1079775 A4 20020731; HK 1037510 A1 20060113; JP 2002510512 A 20020409; RU 2204971 C2 20030527

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20041206

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-07-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61N 5/06 A

2002-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UTAR INTERNATIONAL LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000811

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT