Global Patent Index - EP 1079793 A1

EP 1079793 A1 2001-03-07 - THE USE OF REDUCTIVE COMPOUNDS FOR STRENGTHENING AND IMPROVING THE STRUCTURE OF MATERIALS CONTAINING KERATIN

Title (en)

THE USE OF REDUCTIVE COMPOUNDS FOR STRENGTHENING AND IMPROVING THE STRUCTURE OF MATERIALS CONTAINING KERATIN

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON REDUZIERENDEN VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG UND STRUKTURVERBESSERUNG VON KERATIN ENTHALTENDEN MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE COMPOSES REDUCTEURS POUR RENFORCER ET AMELIORER STRUCTURELLEMENT LES MATERIAUX RENFERMANT DE LA KERATINE

Publication

EP 1079793 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912566 A

Priority

  • DE 19913427 A
  • EP 0002003 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19913427A1] The invention relates to the use of reductive aliphatic or cyclic compounds containing the atom grouping -(HO)C=C(OH)-, including their isomeric forms, and salts and esters thereof in a composition for hardening, strengthening and improving the structure of (restructuring) materials containing keratin and for increasing the volume of fibres containing keratin, especially human hair. The invention also relates to a method for hardening, strengthening and improving the structure of (restructuring) materials containing keratin and for increasing the volume of fibres containing keratin and to a method for increasing the volume of fibres containing keratin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/00; A61K 7/06; A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61Q 3/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/04 (2006.01); A61Q 5/08 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/676 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057839A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19913427 A1 20000928; BR 0005546 A 20010130; EP 1079793 A1 20010307; JP 2002540128 A 20021126; US 6482808 B1 20021119; WO 0057839 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG. DIE ANMELDUNG WURDE VOR DER ERTEILUNG ZURUECKGENOMMEN

2014-01-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-07-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-07-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 562670 T

- Effective date: 20120715

2012-07-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120524

2012-07-11 [REG NL GRER] PATENT GRANTED TOO EARLY

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-07-04 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2012-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-06-29 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG.

2012-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2012-06-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2012-06-08 [REG DE R231] PATENT ABANDONED FOR DE

- Document: DE 50016237

2012-02-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/12 20060101AFI20120117BHEP

2012-02-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/67 20060101ALI20120117BHEP

2012-02-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/00 20060101ALI20120117BHEP

2012-01-17 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50016237

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0007000000

- IPC: A61Q0005120000

2011-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WELLA GMBH

2008-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/12 20060101AFI20080109BHEP

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061219

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE