Global Patent Index - EP 1079938 A1

EP 1079938 A1 2001-03-07 - APPARATUS FOR SORTING OF CHIPS

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR SORTING OF CHIPS

Title (de)

GERÄT ZUM SORTIEREN VON SPÄNEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR TRIER DES COPEAUX

Publication

EP 1079938 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925051 A

Priority

  • FI 9900422 W
  • FI 981136 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961173A1] A method and an apparatus for the sorting of chips (3). The chips, which have kinetic energy, are separated from each other on the basis of the form or the length of their flight curve which depends on their air resistance. The kinetic energy of the chips is generated by a mechanical ejecting device (6) ejecting the chips or by means of a fan conveyor or by means of the wings of a blowing chipper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/02; D21B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 4/02 (2006.01); B07B 9/00 (2006.01); D21B 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/023 (2013.01); B07B 4/025 (2013.01); B07B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961173 A1 19991202; AT 289879 T 20050315; BR 9910486 A 20011016; CA 2333235 A1 19991202; DE 69923966 D1 20050407; DE 69923966 T2 20060406; EP 1079938 A1 20010307; EP 1079938 B1 20050302; ES 2237106 T3 20050716; FI 104271 B1 19991215; FI 104271 B 19991215; FI 981136 A0 19980522; ID 30123 A 20011108

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060518

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060517

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-02-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237106 T3

2005-06-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923966 P 20050407

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR SORTING OF CHIPS

2004-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER PORI OY

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020715

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE