Global Patent Index - EP 1079940 B1

EP 1079940 B1 2001-12-05 - DEVICE FOR PLACING STACKED ENVELOPES IN A TOTE BOX

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PLACING STACKED ENVELOPES IN A TOTE BOX

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINBRINGEN VON GESTAPELTEN KUVERTS IN EINEN TRANSPORTKASTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR INTRODUIRE DES ENVELOPPES EMPILEES DANS UN BAC DE MANUTENTION

Publication

EP 1079940 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927694 A

Priority

  • DE 9901191 W
  • DE 19822998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822998A1] Horizontally superimposed stacks of envelopes are contained in the crate. A platform (7) holds a group(2a) of envelopes and has at least two spaced apart, vertical side guides (8). The side of the platform facing the removal-slide piece (9) has a cube-shaped transfer crate (11) open towards the platform, and with a closure appliance (12) opening on the end(11A) facing away from the platform. the transfer crate swivels by 90 degrees on a vertically movable horizontal axis (A1). The filling unit (18) is below the transfer crate's area of movement. A holder (21) has at least one vertically movable holder element (26) and a forward thrust appliance (22) with forward thrust element (31).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/02; B65B 25/14; B65H 31/30; B65H 31/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/14 (2006.01); B07C 1/02 (2006.01); B65H 31/30 (2006.01); B65H 31/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822998 A1 19991125; DE 19822998 C2 20000525; CA 2321442 A1 19991202; EP 1079940 A1 20010307; EP 1079940 B1 20011205; ES 2168017 T3 20020516; JP 2002516242 A 20020604; WO 9961175 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900504

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2011-09-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BOWE SYSTEC GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110510

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOEWE SYSTEC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOEWE SYSTEC AG, 86159 AUGSBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59900504

- Effective date: 20110429

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080418

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080418

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080418

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080417

2008-12-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2004-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168017 T3

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900504 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000415

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE