Global Patent Index - EP 1079947 A1

EP 1079947 A1 2001-03-07 - BOTT FOR SEALING VESSELS CONTAINING MOLTEN METAL

Title (en)

BOTT FOR SEALING VESSELS CONTAINING MOLTEN METAL

Title (de)

STOPFEN FÜR DEN VERSCHLUSS VON METALLSCHMELZE AUFNEHMENDEN BEHÄLTNISSEN

Title (fr)

BOUCHON POUR FERMER DES CUVES CONTENANT DES METAUX EN FUSION

Publication

EP 1079947 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923554 A

Priority

  • DE 19823988 A
  • EP 9903145 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823988A1] The invention relates to a bott for sealing vessels containing molten metal, comprising an e.g., rod-shaped stopping body which consists of a fireproof material and which has a bore for releasably engaging an e.g. metal fixing rod for mounting on a lifting mechanism. Said fixing rod has at least two diametrically opposite locking projections at its fixing end, said locking projections protruding outwards radially from the periphery of the fixing rod. The locking projections can be moved into longitudinal slots provided in the stopping body until they reach an axial position in which the fixing rod can be turned in relation to the stopping body with the locking projections, said longitudinal slots being angularly offset in relation to each other and being adjacent to the bore, until they reach a position in which the locking projections can enter detent recesses in the stopping body by moving in a direction axial to the upper end of the stopping body, said detent recesses being angularly offset in relation to each other. The invention also relates to an alternative embodiment of the inventive bott.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/18 (2013.01); B22D 41/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962659A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823988 A1 19991209; DE 19823988 C2 20000720; AU 4038999 A 19991220; EP 1079947 A1 20010307; EP 1079947 B1 20020724; EP 1177845 A1 20020206; EP 1177845 B1 20030730; ES 2183556 T3 20030316; ES 2203571 T3 20040416; TW 407080 B 20001001; WO 9962659 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090507

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090508

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090508

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090507

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090507

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIDIER-WERKE A.G.

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183556 T3

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021003

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902127 20020829

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PLUG FOR SEALING VESSELS CONTAINING MOLTEN METAL

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001009

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT