Global Patent Index - EP 1079948 A1

EP 1079948 A1 2001-03-07 - COMPOSITE PART CONTAINING METALLIC FOAM

Title (en)

COMPOSITE PART CONTAINING METALLIC FOAM

Title (de)

METALLSCHAUM ENTHALTENDES VERBUNDBAUTEIL

Title (fr)

PIECE COMPOSITE CONTENANT DE LA MOUSSE METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1079948 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00915140 A

Priority

  • DE 0000670 W
  • DE 19911213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054911A1] The invention relates to a composite part (1) consisting of at least two solid metal sheet parts (4, 5) which face each other with a layer of metallic powder to be expanded between them. The composite part has additional reinforcing elements (9) in individual cross-sectional areas, said elements being connected to the expanded layer of metallic powder (6, 7) that surrounds them with a form fit. Said expanded layer is connected to the outlying solid metal sheet parts in such a way that they cannot be separated non-destructively. The invention also relates to a method for producing the inventive composite part. According to said method, each solid metal sheet part (4, 5) is provided with a metallic powder layer (6, 7). The two sheet parts (4, 5) are then arranged on top of each other with the sides that have been provided with the metallic powder layer (6 and 7) facing towards each other. The thus superposed sheet parts are heated by applying heat in such a way that a joint that cannot be separated non-destructively is produced between the metallic powder layers (6, 7) facing each other by means of a heat-dependent expanding process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 3/11; B22F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/1118 (2013.01); B22F 7/006 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12042 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12069 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12097 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12153 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12736 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/1125

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054911A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054911 A1 20000921; DE 19911213 C1 20001109; EP 1079948 A1 20010307; EP 1079948 B1 20050511; ES 2240077 T3 20051016; US 6444330 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080307

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080308

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080307

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080308

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080308

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080307

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240077 T3

2005-08-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-06-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITE PART CONTAINING METALLIC FOAM

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040203

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE