Global Patent Index - EP 1079950 A1

EP 1079950 A1 2001-03-07 - SINTER-ACTIVE METAL AND ALLOY POWDERS FOR POWDER METALLURGY APPLICATIONS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND THEIR USE

Title (en)

SINTER-ACTIVE METAL AND ALLOY POWDERS FOR POWDER METALLURGY APPLICATIONS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND THEIR USE

Title (de)

SINTERAKTIVE METALL- UND LEGIERUNGSPULVER FÜR PULVERMETALLURGISCHE ANWENDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

POUDRES DE METAL ET D'ALLIAGE POUR LE FRITTAGE, A UTILISER DANS LA METALLURGIE DES POUDRES, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1079950 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923562 A

Priority

  • DE 19822663 A
  • EP 9903170 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822663A1] The invention relates to a method for producing metal and alloy powders containing at least one of the metals iron, copper, tin, cobalt or nickel. According to the method an aqueous solutions of metal salts is mixed with an aqueous carboxylic acid solution, the precipitation product is separated from the mother liquor and the precipitation product is reduced to metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 5/12 (2006.01); B22F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 9/22 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + C22C 1/051 + C22C 26/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959755A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FI FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822663 A1 19991202; AT 246976 T 20030815; AU 4039399 A 19991206; CA 2332889 A1 19991125; CA 2332889 C 20100406; CN 1254339 C 20060503; CN 1301205 A 20010627; EP 1079950 A1 20010307; EP 1079950 B1 20030813; JP 2002515543 A 20020528; JP 2009001908 A 20090108; JP 4257690 B2 20090422; US 6554885 B1 20030429; WO 9959755 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906598

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20030403990

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140509

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 246976

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140508

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906598

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130517

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130508

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: H.C. STARCK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20090923

2009-09-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: H.C. STARCK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20090923

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-11-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030403990

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906598

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB GR IT NL SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: H.C. STARCK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB GR IT NL SE