Global patent index - EP 1079954 A1

EP 1079954 A1 2001-03-07 - ABRASIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING A BARRIER COATING

Title (en)

ABRASIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING A BARRIER COATING

Title (de)

SPERRSCHICHT ENTHALTENDES SCHLEIFMITTEL

Title (fr)

ARTICLE ABRASIF COMPRENANT UN REVETEMENT PROTECTEUR

Publication

EP 1079954 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920255 A

Priority

  • US 9909562 W
  • US 8093698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959778A1] An abrasive article is formed having a barrier coating coextensive with and interposed between a backing and an abrasive coating. The hardened barrier coating essentially eliminates penetration of the abrasive coating into the backing, especially volatile materials. The barrier coating comprising as starting materials a water-borne resin that upon hardening forms a crystalline or semi-crystalline polymer, a major polyfunctional cross-linking agent, and at least one minor polyfunctional cross-linking agent. The minor polyfunctional cross-linking agent enhances the attachment of the abrasive coating to the barrier coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 3/00; B24D 11/02; B32B 27/26; C09D 201/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/02 (2006.01); B32B 27/26 (2006.01); C09D 201/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/26 (2013.01); B24D 3/004 (2013.01); B24D 11/02 (2013.01); C09D 201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959778A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959778 A1 19991125; AU 3779799 A 19991206; DE 69909783 D1 20030828; EP 1079954 A1 20010307; EP 1079954 B1 20030723; JP 2002515350 A 20020528; US 6217432 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060417

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020124

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB