Global Patent Index - EP 1079959 A1

EP 1079959 A1 2001-03-07 - SELF-ADJUSTABLE RABBET SUPPORT FOR CUTTING MACHINE IN PARTICULAR FOR MITRED FRAME MOULDINGS

Title (en)

SELF-ADJUSTABLE RABBET SUPPORT FOR CUTTING MACHINE IN PARTICULAR FOR MITRED FRAME MOULDINGS

Title (de)

SELBSTJUSTIERENDE FALZSTÜTZE FÜR GEHRUNGSSÄGEN INSBESONDERE FÜR RAHMENPROFILTEILE

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE FEUILLURE AUTOREGLABLE POUR MACHINE A COUPER EN ONGLET NOTAMMENT DE MOULURES D'ENCADREMENT

Publication

EP 1079959 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99919338 A

Priority

  • FR 9901166 W
  • FR 9806219 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778595A1] The rabbet support (1) comprises a square shaped rabbet bottom stop (13) mounted on a rod (12) which can be moved on the support. A return spring (14) is inserted between the end of the rod and the support base. The rod is locked at the top by a clamping collar (15) the flanges of which can be clamped by a locking lever when the stop has been positioned against the molding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27G 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27G 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959783A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778595 A1 19991119; FR 2778595 B1 20000623; AR 016028 A1 20010530; AT 220365 T 20020715; AU 3714899 A 19991206; AU 754093 B2 20021107; BR 9910435 A 20010109; CA 2333180 A1 19991125; DE 69902099 D1 20020814; DE 69902099 T2 20021107; DK 1079959 T3 20021028; EP 1079959 A1 20010307; EP 1079959 B1 20020710; ES 2181422 T3 20030216; JP 2002515358 A 20020528; MX PA00011251 A 20031015; PT 1079959 E 20021031; WO 9959783 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69902099

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-12-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-11-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-03-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-04-18 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030418

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030415

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181422 T3

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403128

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-10-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902099 20020814

2002-08-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220365 T 20020715

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE