Global patent index - EP 1079967 A1

EP 1079967 A1 2001-03-07 - LIQUID LABELING WITH FLUORESCENT MICROPARTICLES

Title (en)

LIQUID LABELING WITH FLUORESCENT MICROPARTICLES

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGE MARKIERUNG MIT FLUOREZIERENDEN MIKROPARTIKELN

Title (fr)

MARQUAGE LIQUIDE A L'AIDE DE MICROPARTICULES FLUORESCENTES

Publication

EP 1079967 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917429 A

Priority

  • US 9907993 W
  • US 8148798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952708A1] Methods of labeling liquids, solids, aerosols, and gases with fluorescent microparticles and/or with microparticles encoded with at least one other discriminator. Labeling protocols are described for such uses as adding at least one date code (for example, the expiration date of a perishable liquid), encoding routing information for one or more liquids in a pipeline having a plurality of branch points, tracing the flow of toxic or other substances into groundwater, tracing liquid flow from a point source into groundwater, tracing groundwater flow, adding a donor Social Security Number, adding a donor name, tracing flow of a liquid or a gas in a living system, adding unique identification to each of a plurality of liquid, solid or gaseous samples, encoding routing information to each of a plurality of liquid samples in a multiplexed analytical system, encoding routing information to each of a plurality of liquid reagents in a multiplexed analytical system, and combinations thereof. In one embodiment, two different fluorescent dye labels are bound to microparticles at eight independent, different concentrations each to create an 8 x 8 = 64 array of distinct microparticle sets suitable for labeling liquids, solids, and gases. When three discriminators are used at 8 levels each, an 8 x 8 x 8 = 512 array of distinct microparticle sets is created. Discriminators include such parameters as particle physical property, particle concentration, spectral property, dye type, dye concentration, label type, and combinations thereof; where particle physical property includes such attributes as particle size, particle shape, particle hydrophobicity, particle hydrophilicity, particle density, and combinations thereof; where spectral property includes such attributes as dye fluroescence absorption, dye fluorescence emission, dye absorption, dye fluorescence polarization, dye fluorescence lifetime, and combinations thereof; and where label type includes such attributes as magnetic property, reactive group, nuclear magnetic resonance, electron spin resonance, positron emission, radioactive property, fluorescence polarization, fluorescence lifetime, and combinations thereof. Kits are devised to permit users to create a large variety of sets of particles for identification purposes in liquids, solids, and gases, and microprocessor controlled, automatic pipetting of kit microparticles are also encompassed by the instant invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/58 (2006.01); G06K 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/585 (2013.01); G06K 19/06009 (2013.01); G06K 2019/06234 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952708 A1 19991021; AU 3555599 A 19991101; EP 1079967 A1 20010307; EP 1079967 A4 20030723

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032770

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-07-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 09K 11/06 A

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/18 B

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/28 B

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001110;LT PAYMENT 20001110;LV PAYMENT 20001110;MK PAYMENT 20001110;RO PAYMENT 20001110;SI PAYMENT 20001110