Global Patent Index - EP 1079975 A1

EP 1079975 A1 2001-03-07 - DEVICE FOR SYMBOL PRINTING AND FRANKING MACHINE COMPRISING SAME

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SYMBOL PRINTING AND FRANKING MACHINE COMPRISING SAME

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM DRUCKEN EINES ZEICHENS UND DAMIT VERSEHENE FRANKIERMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR IMPRIMER UN SIGNE ET MACHINE A AFFRANCHIR LE COMPORTANT

Publication

EP 1079975 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00910948 A

Priority

  • FR 0000624 W
  • FR 9903253 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790997A1] The invention concerns a device comprising a belt (10) with one side opposite unsprung support means and extending between an upstream roller (19) and a downstream roller (22) both suspended so that the object (2) can be sandwiched between the unsprung support means and said belt (10) side, the latter being wound around at least two other rollers (18, 20, 21) whereof at least one (18, 21) is unsprung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/12; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/12 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); B41J 11/007 (2013.01); B41J 13/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054976A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790997 A1 20000922; FR 2790997 B1 20010601; CA 2330809 A1 20000921; CA 2330809 C 20070828; DE 60032076 D1 20070111; DE 60032076 T2 20070628; EP 1079975 A1 20010307; EP 1079975 B1 20061129; US 6431778 B1 20020813; WO 0054976 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090315

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090315

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032076 P 20070111

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SECAP (GROUPE PITNEY BOWES)

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASCOM HASLER MAILING SYSTEMS AG

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE