Global Patent Index - EP 1079976 A1

EP 1079976 A1 2001-03-07 - THERMAL PRINTER WITH INK RIBBON FOR OFFICE TERMINAL

Title (en)

THERMAL PRINTER WITH INK RIBBON FOR OFFICE TERMINAL

Title (de)

THERMODRUCKER MIT FARBBAND FÜR EIN BÜRODATENENDGERÄT

Title (fr)

IMPRIMANTE THERMIQUE A RUBAN ENCREUR POUR TERMINAL DE BUREAU

Publication

EP 1079976 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920894 A

Priority

  • FR 9901198 W
  • FR 9806367 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778869A1] The thermal printer has a print head (1) facing a platen (2). The paper (20) and print ribbon (21) pass between print head and platen, with a spring (3) pressing the head against ribbon and paper. The ribbon is separated (4) from the paper as it is wound onto a powered (24) collection spool (23), driven from the same controller (10,11) as the paper transport roller (5,6) drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959824A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778869 A1 19991126; FR 2778869 B1 20000623; DE 69911595 D1 20031030; DE 69911595 T2 20040624; EP 1079976 A1 20010307; EP 1079976 B1 20030924; WO 9959824 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160520

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69911595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69911595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130129

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69911595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69911595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ,

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69911595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-11-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM DOCUMENTS SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20111005

2010-08-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-04-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090326 AND 20090401

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2006-05-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-05-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-05-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69911595

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB