Global patent index - EP 1080013 A1

EP 1080013 A1 2001-03-07 - TEMPORARY PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE

Title (en)

TEMPORARY PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE

Title (de)

VORLÄUFIGE VERPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE TEMPORAIRE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1080013 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920430 A

Priority

  • US 9910324 W
  • US 8060998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959873A1] A temporary packaging method and a resultant package are provided for comprising temporarily bonding containers on a flat base member to stabilize the containers for further packaging, the method comprising the steps of providing a base member, providing containers, temporarily bonding the containers to the base member with a hot melt adhesive, advancing the base member with containers through the packaging or handling system so that further processing of the containers may optionally be effected, encapsulating the base member and bonded containers with a plastic shrink film to complete the package, followed by release of the containers from the bond to base member within minutes after shrink wrapping, with the adhesive remaining bonded to the base member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 15/00; B65B 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 15/00 (2006.01); B65B 21/04 (2006.01); B65B 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 21/245 (2013.01); B65B 15/00 (2013.01); B65B 21/04 (2013.01); B65B 53/00 (2013.01); Y10S 206/813 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959873A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959873 A1 19991125; AU 3792699 A 19991206; AU 738144 B2 20010913; BR 9910444 A 20010102; CA 2331856 A1 19991125; CA 2331856 C 20050419; CN 1163378 C 20040825; CN 1307530 A 20010808; DE 69906721 D1 20030515; DE 69906721 T2 20031023; EP 1080013 A1 20010307; EP 1080013 B1 20030409; ES 2193701 T3 20031101; JP 2002515380 A 20020528; US 2003150760 A1 20030814; US 2005167314 A1 20050804; US 6182422 B1 20010206; US 6499596 B1 20021231; US 6874633 B2 20050405; US 7392905 B2 20080701

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140511

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140511

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69906721

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130131

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100511

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193701

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERSEN, DALE, C.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LASECKE, DONALD, J.

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001202

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT