Global Patent Index - EP 1080022 A1

EP 1080022 A1 2001-03-07 - OPEN-SIDED CARGO FREIGHT CONTAINER

Title (en)

OPEN-SIDED CARGO FREIGHT CONTAINER

Title (de)

OFFENSEITIGER FRACHTCONTAINER

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR DE TRANSPORT OUVERT SUR LE COTE

Publication

EP 1080022 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922359 A

Priority

  • GB 9901587 W
  • GB 9810891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2337509A] An open-sided container 1 comprises at least one angled stay 8 connected between a bottom side rail 2 and an end wall 3, detachably mounted at one end and pivotally mounted at the other. The stay may be mounted on the end wall by a universal swivel joint 10, and have an elongate aperture (21, fig 3) at the other end for cooperating with a clevis and pin arrangement (23, 23A, 24, 24A, figs 4 and 5) on the bottom side rail. The elongate aperture allows the angled stay to be easily detached when the container is free of strain to allow access for loading and also provides support when the container is being lifted. There may also be intermediate posts 7 extending between a roof 6 and the bottom side rail to provide further support. A curtain 41 may cover the container, tensioned by buckles attached to the base. The container maybe used as a freight container transferrable from one vehicle to another, and may be stored in a stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/12 (2006.01); B65D 88/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/127 (2013.01); B65D 88/121 (2013.01); B65D 88/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959899A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2337509 A 19991124; GB 2337509 B 20020731; GB 9810891 D0 19980722; AU 3945899 A 19991206; DE 69916048 D1 20040506; DE 69916048 T2 20041209; EP 1080022 A1 20010307; EP 1080022 B1 20040331; WO 9959899 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-05-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040507

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916048 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT