Global patent index - EP 1080073 A1

EP 1080073 A1 2001-03-07 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2-PHENYL-INDOLE COMPOUNDS AND ESTROGEN FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING 2-PHENYL-INDOLE COMPOUNDS AND ESTROGEN FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS 2-PHENYL-INDOL VERBINDUNGEN UND ÖSTROGEN FORMULIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES COMPOSES A BASE DE 2-PHENYL-INDOLE ET DE FORMULATIONS D'OESTROGENES

Publication

EP 1080073 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921832 A

Priority

  • US 9910215 W
  • US 7964498 A
  • US 7960498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959969A1] The present invention relates to the use of 3-[4-(2-phenyl-Indol-1-ylmethyl)-phenyl]Acrylamide compounds and 2-phenyl-1-[4-(amino-1-yl-alk-1-ynyl)benzyl]-1H-indol-5-ol compounds which are useful as estrogenic agents, as well as pharmaceutical compositions and methods of treatment utilizing these compounds, the compounds having general formula (I) or (II).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 209/12; A61K 31/40; C07D 403/12; C07D 413/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/565 (2006.01); A61K 31/566 (2006.01); A61K 31/567 (2006.01); A61P 5/30 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); C07D 209/10 (2006.01); C07D 209/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/5377 (2013.01); A61K 31/404 (2013.01); A61K 31/454 (2013.01); C07D 209/10 (2013.01); C07D 209/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959969A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959969 A1 19991125; AU 3894299 A 19991206; CA 2331318 A1 19991125; CN 1309637 A 20010822; EP 1080073 A1 20010307; JP 2002515484 A 20020528

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1034244

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001103;LT PAYMENT 20001103;LV PAYMENT 20001103;MK PAYMENT 20001103;RO PAYMENT 20001103;SI PAYMENT 20001103