Global patent index - EP 1080110 A2

EP 1080110 A2 2001-03-07 - USE OF ACTIVATED T CELLS, NERVOUS SYSTEM-SPECIFIC ANTIGENS FOR TREATING DISORDERS OF THE NEVROUS SYSTEM

Title (en)

USE OF ACTIVATED T CELLS, NERVOUS SYSTEM-SPECIFIC ANTIGENS FOR TREATING DISORDERS OF THE NEVROUS SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON AKTIVIERTEN T ZELLEN, NERVENSYSTEM-SPEZIFISCHEN ANTIGENE ZUR BEHANDLUND VON ERKRANKUNGEN DES NERVENSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

LYMPHOCYTES T ACTIVES, ANTIGENES SPECIFIQUES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1080110 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99923190 A

Priority

  • IL 12455098 A
  • US 9910953 W
  • US 9814715 W
  • US 21827798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960021A2] Compositions and methods are provided for treating injury to or disease of the central or peripheral nervous system. In one embodiment, treatment is effected using activated T cells that recognize an antigen of the nervous system or a peptide derived therefrom or a derivative thereof to promote nerve regeneration or to prevent or inhibit neuronal degeneration within the nervous system. Treatment involves administering an NS-specific antigen or peptide derived therefrom or a derivative thereof, or a nucleotide sequence encoding said antigen or peptide, to promote nerve regeneration or to prevent or inhibit neuronal degeneration in the nervous system, either the central nervous system or the peripheral nervous system. The NS-specific activated T cells can be administered alone or in combination with NS-specific antigen or peptide derived therefrom or a derivative thereof or a nucleotide sequence encoding said antigen or peptide, or any combination thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47; A61K 39/00; C07K 14/705; C12N 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 35/26 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1709 (2013.01); A61K 39/0007 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5158 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960021A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960021 A2 19991125; WO 9960021 A3 20000615; AU 4001799 A 19991206; CA 2328612 A1 19991125; EP 1080110 A2 20010307; JP 2003532618 A 20031105

INPADOC legal status

2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1036072

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMEMT CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-03-21 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001205;LT PAYMENT 20001205;LV PAYMENT 20001205;MK PAYMENT 20001205;RO PAYMENT 20001205;SI PAYMENT 20001205

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001229;LT PAYMENT 20001229;LV PAYMENT 20001229;MK PAYMENT 20001229;RO PAYMENT 20001229;SI PAYMENT 20001229