Global patent index - EP 1080113 A1

EP 1080113 A1 2001-03-07 - TREATMENT OF HUMAN TUMORS WITH RADIATION AND INHIBITORS OF GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASES

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF HUMAN TUMORS WITH RADIATION AND INHIBITORS OF GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASES

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG VON HUMANEN TUMOREN MIT BESTRAHLUNG UND INHIBITOREN DER WACHSTUMSFAKTORREZEPTOR-TYROSINKINASE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS HUMAINES A L'AIDE D'UN RAYONNEMENT ET D'INHIBITEURS DE TYROSINE KINASES DE RECEPTEURS DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE

Publication

EP 1080113 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924253 A

Priority

  • US 9910741 W
  • US 8561398 P
  • US 7961298 A
  • US 20613898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960023A1] A method to inhibit the growth of tumors in human patients, comprising treating the human patients with an effective amount of a combination of radiation and a non-radiolabeled protein receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitor, the overexpression of which can lead to tumorigenesis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/00; A61K 39/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/2863 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • EP 0787722 A1 19970806 - AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]
  • EP 0359282 B1 19950524 - RORER INT OVERSEAS [US]
  • BALABAN N. ET AL: "THE EFFECT OF IONIZING RADIATION ON SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION: ANTIBODIEST EGF RECEPTOR SENSITIZE A431 CELLS TO RADIATION", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, vol. 1314, no. 1/2, 1996, pages 147 - 156, XP001055207
  • EZEKIEL M.P. ET AL: "PHASE I STUDY OF ANTI-EPIDERMAL GROWTH RECEPTOR (EGFR) ANTIBODY C225 IN COMBINATION WITH IRRADIATION IN PATIENTS WITH ADVANCED SQUAMOUS CELL CARCINOMA OF THE HEAD AND NECK SCCHN)", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, 34TH ANNUAL MEETING, PROGRAMM/PROCEEDINGS, vol. 17, 16 May 1998 (1998-05-16) - 19 May 1998 (1998-05-19), XP002956751
  • See also references of WO 9960023A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960023 A1 19991125; AU 4079999 A 19991206; BR 9910511 A 20011120; CA 2332331 A1 19991125; CN 1314917 A 20010926; CZ 20004224 A3 20020213; EP 1080113 A1 20010307; EP 1080113 A4 20020417; IL 139707 D0 20020210; JP 2002515511 A 20020528; MX PA00011248 A 20040906; PL 348634 A1 20020603; SK 17282000 A3 20020404

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050531

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-04-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07K 16/00 A, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7A 61N 5/10 B, 7C 07K 16/28 B

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WAKSAL, HARLAN, W.

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SALEH, MANSOOR, N.

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROBERT, FRANCISCO

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BUCHSBAUM, DONALD, JAY

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE