Global Patent Index - EP 1080166 A1

EP 1080166 A1 2001-03-07 - FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING HYDROCARBYL-SUBSTITUTED POLYOXYALKYLENE AMINES

Title (en)

FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING HYDROCARBYL-SUBSTITUTED POLYOXYALKYLENE AMINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HYDROKARBYL-SUBSTITUIERTEN POLYOXYALKYLENAMINEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE CARBURANT CONTENANT DES AMINES POLYOXYALKYLENE SUBSTITUEES PAR HYDROCARBYLE

Publication

EP 1080166 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00910199 A

Priority

  • US 0003923 W
  • US 25254099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049109A1] A fuel composition comprising a major amount of hydrocarbons boiling in the gasoline or diesel range and about 2,050 to about 10,000 parts per million by weight of a hydrocarbyl-substituted polyoxyalkylene amine having formula (I) or a fuel-soluble salt thereof; wherein R is a hydrocarbyl group having from about 1 to about 30 carbon atoms; R1 and R2 are each independently hydrogen or lower alkyl having about 1 to about 6 carbon atoms and each R1 and R2 is independently selected in each -O-CHR1-CHR2-unit; A is amino, N-alkyl amino having about 1 to about 20 carbon atoms in the alkyl group, N,N-dialkyl amino having about 1 to about 20 carbon atoms in each alkyl group, or a polyamine moiety having about 2 to about 12 amine nitrogen atoms and about 2 to about 40 carbon atoms; and x is an integer from about 5 to about 100. The fuel compositions of the present invention are useful for the prevention and control of engine deposits, particularly combustion chamber deposits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/18; C10L 1/22; C10L 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/234 (2006.01); C10L 1/2387 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/238 (2006.01); C10L 1/2383 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/238 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049109 A1 20000824; AU 3233200 A 20000904; AU 767400 B2 20031106; BR 0004867 A 20001219; BR 0004867 B1 20110322; CA 2326831 A1 20000824; CA 2326831 C 20080708; CN 1146652 C 20040421; CN 1296520 A 20010523; DE 60045464 D1 20110217; EP 1080166 A1 20010307; EP 1080166 A4 20040804; EP 1080166 B1 20110105; ID 26129 A 20001123; JP 2002537439 A 20021105; JP 4714345 B2 20110629; MX PA00009978 A 20020806; NZ 507247 A 20030630; US 6217624 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60045464

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111006

2011-04-13 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-02-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60045464

- Effective date: 20110217

2011-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60045464 P 20110217

2011-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2011-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/2387 20060101AFI20100322BHEP

2010-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/00 20060101ALI20100322BHEP

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-08-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10L 1/18 A

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10L 1/22 B

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10L 10/00 B

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORRIS, JACK, E.

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOORE, STEPHEN, M.

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SABOURIN, EDWARD, T.

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE