Global Patent Index - EP 1080180 A2

EP 1080180 A2 2001-03-07 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

AUSGESCHIEDENE PROTEINE UND FÜR DIESE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT POUR CES DERNIERES

Publication

EP 1080180 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99924280 A

Priority

  • US 9910843 W
  • US 8547298 P
  • US 9682498 P
  • US 9995098 P
  • US 9984398 P
  • US 10042498 P
  • US 10232998 P
  • US 10361598 P
  • US 11179998 P
  • US 11215998 P
  • US 11441598 P
  • US 24805999 A
  • US 28715099 A
  • US 31102199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958642A2] Novel polynucleotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/02 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); A61P 15/16 (2006.01); A61P 15/18 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958642A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958642 A2 19991118; WO 9958642 A3 20000302; CA 2328062 A1 19991118; EP 1080180 A2 20010307; JP 2003530296 A 20031014

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 14/00 A, 7C 07K 14/435 B, 7C 12N 5/16 B, 7C 12N 15/12 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WONG, GORDON, G.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLARK, HILARY, F.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FECHTEL, KIM

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AGOSTINO, MICHAEL, J.

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE