Global Patent Index - EP 1080188 A2

EP 1080188 A2 2001-03-07 - HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF UTERUS MYOMA TISSUE

Title (en)

HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF UTERUS MYOMA TISSUE

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE NUKLEINSÄUREFRAGMENTE, DEREN EXPRESSION IN UTERUSMYOMGEWEBE ERHOEHT IST

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE PROVENANT D'UN FIBROME UTERIN

Publication

EP 1080188 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99927686 A

Priority

  • DE 9901178 W
  • DE 19817947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817947A1] Polypeptide sequences (I) and their fragments are new and comprise 19 open reading frame sequences given in the specification, that are highly expressed in uterine myoma. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) 31 specific nucleic acids (II) encoding (I), comprising amino acid sequences fully defined in the specification; (2) bacterial or phage artificial chromosomes and cosmid clones containing functional genes, or the chromosome region containing them, corresponding to (II) for use as gene transfer vehicles; (3) antisense sequences to (II); (4) an expression cassette (III) comprising (II), or their fragments, plus control and regulatory sequences; (5) DNA fragments (IV) containing a gene isolated using (II); (6) host cells (V) containing (II) as a heterologous component; (7) recombinant production of (I), or their fragments, by culturing (V); (8) an antibody (VI) directed against (I), or its fragments, encoded by (II); and (9) 20 partial polypeptide sequences, all reproduced, and sequences having at least 80% homology with them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954448A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817947 A1 19991028; EP 1080188 A2 20010307; JP 2002512024 A 20020423; WO 9954448 A2 19991028; WO 9954448 A3 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HINZMANN, BERND, DR.

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE, PROF.

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPECHT, THOMAS, DR.

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PILARSKY, CHRISTIAN, DR.

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040121

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METAGEN PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE