Global Patent Index - EP 1080196 A1

EP 1080196 A1 2001-03-07 - POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES AND THEIR USE IN A METHOD OF PRODUCING PLANTS WITH AN INCREASED NUMBER OF STOMATA

Title (en)

POLYNUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES AND THEIR USE IN A METHOD OF PRODUCING PLANTS WITH AN INCREASED NUMBER OF STOMATA

Title (de)

POLYNUKLEOTIDSEUENZEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN EINER METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PFLANZEN MIT ERHÖHTER ANZAHL VON SPALTÖFFNUNGEN

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UNE METHODE DE PRODUCTION DE PLANTES A NOMBRE ACCRU DE STOMATES

Publication

EP 1080196 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918107 A

Priority

  • GB 9901191 W
  • GB 9808304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954471A1] A method of producing plants with an increased number of stomata relative to control plants comprises the steps of: (i) inhibiting in plant material the production of fatty acids which stimulate the synthesis of the 14-3-3 class of transcription factors, or otherwise preventing the fatty acids from stimulating the synthesis of the said factors; (ii) selecting the thus inhibited material; and (iii) regenerating the thus selected material into plants. The inhibition may be achieved by sense co-suppression or anti-sense inhibition of an endogenous gene comprising a sequence which is complementary to one which when incubated at a temperature of between 60 and 65 DEG C in 0.3 strength citrate buffered saline containing 0.1 % SDS followed by rinsing at the same temperature with 0.3 strength citrate buffered saline containing 0.1 % SDS still hybridises with the sequence depicted in SEQ ID No.1. Preferred sequences for use in this method are depicted as SEQ ID No.1 and 2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/29; A01H 5/00; A01H 5/02; A01H 5/08; A01H 5/10; C12N 9/10; C12N 15/54; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01H 5/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/415 (2013.01); C12N 9/1029 (2013.01); C12N 15/8225 (2013.01); C12N 15/8237 (2013.01); C12N 15/8247 (2013.01); C12N 15/8261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954471A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954471 A1 19991028; AU 3615199 A 19991108; BR 9909765 A 20001219; CA 2324442 A1 19991028; CN 1376198 A 20021023; EP 1080196 A1 20010307; GB 9808304 D0 19980617; JP 2002512035 A 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040316

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031103

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE