Global patent index - EP 1080234 A1

EP 1080234 A1 2001-03-07 - METHOD FOR GRANULATING AND REDUCING LIQUID SLAG AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GRANULATING AND REDUCING LIQUID SLAG AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM GRANULIEREN UND ZERKLEINERN VON FLÜSSIGEN SCHLACKEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE GRANULER ET DE FRACTIONNER DES SCORIES LIQUIDES AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1080234 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907332 A

Priority

  • AT 0000044 W
  • AT 31699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0050647A1] The invention relates to a method for granulating and reducing liquid slag. According to said method, the liquid slag is introduced into an expansion chamber and a cooling area. The liquid slag is drawn into said expansion chamber (4), which is subjected to a vacuum, and transported into the cooling area (10) with a driving jet. The vacuum in the expansion chamber (4) can be adjusted using a controllable flow control valve (6) in the slag inlet (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0050647A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 0050647 A1 20000831; AT 406954 B 20001127; AT A31699 A 20000315; AU 2894700 A 20000914; CA 2330126 A1 20000831; EP 1080234 A1 20010307; ZA 200005925 B 20020123

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT LU

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020829

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOLCIM LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE