Global patent index - EP 1080236 A1

EP 1080236 A1 2001-03-07 - VARIABLY INSERTABLE COMBINED LANCE WITH DISPLACEABLE BURNER AND BLOWER LANCE BODIES

Title (en)

VARIABLY INSERTABLE COMBINED LANCE WITH DISPLACEABLE BURNER AND BLOWER LANCE BODIES

Title (de)

VARIABEL EINSETZBARE KOMBILANZE MIT VERSCHIEBBAREN BRENNER- UND BLASLANZENKÖRPERN

Title (fr)

LANCE COMBINEE POLYVALENTE AVEC CORPS DE BRULEUR ET CORPS DE LANCE DE SOUFFLAGE COULISSANTS

Publication

EP 1080236 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927699 A

Priority

  • DE 9901202 W
  • DE 19817590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817590C1] The invention relates to a lance for processing liquid molten metal baths located in metallurgical tanks, comprising an internal guide tube for feeding gases, more particularly oxygen, having a lance mouth for blowing the gas, wherein the lance has a burner nozzle formed in the head end area of the mouth of the lance for executing a burner function with the purpose of guiding the gas through. The invention aims at providing protection of the burner nozzles against material splashes. To this end, the internal guide pipe (11) having a first cooling jacket (14) is configured as a first lance body (10) and the fuel gas channels (18) having a second cooling jacket (20) are configured as a second lance body (17). The first lance body (10) is mounted in the second lance body (17) and can be shifted from a raised position in which it operates as a burner to a lowered position in which it operates as a blower and in which the burner nozzles (19) are covered by the first lance body (10) that projects downwards in relation to the end of the second lance body (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/52; C21C 5/46; C21C 7/10; F27B 3/08; F27B 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/46 (2006.01); C21C 5/48 (2006.01); C21C 7/072 (2006.01); C21C 7/10 (2006.01); F27B 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/10 (2013.01); C21C 5/4606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954511A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817590 C1 19990318; AT 219156 T 20020615; BR 9909769 A 20010130; CN 1214120 C 20050810; CN 1305536 A 20010725; EP 1080236 A1 20010307; EP 1080236 B1 20020612; ES 2180305 T3 20030201; RU 2211248 C2 20030827; US 6368550 B1 20020409; WO 9954511 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130420

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130419

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130419

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130419

2013-12-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59901746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131028

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHOLOGIES G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110419

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110420

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120507

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110419

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 219156

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-09 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20111101

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100407

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2009-08-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2009-08-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-08-28 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2009-08-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2180305

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 219156

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAI FUCHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE