Global patent index - EP 1080249 A1

EP 1080249 A1 2001-03-07 - METHOD FOR INSERTING AT LEAST ONE GROOVE INTO A BOREHOLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INSERTING AT LEAST ONE GROOVE INTO A BOREHOLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN MINDESTENS EINER NUT IN EINE BOHRUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'AU MOINS UNE RAINURE DANS UN ALESAGE

Publication

EP 1080249 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00916759 A

Priority

  • DE 0000519 W
  • DE 19907927 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0050665A1] According to the inventive method, a photosensitive layer (4) is mounted on the inner surface (3) of the borehole (1). Said layer (4) is exposed according to an exposure pattern (8) that corresponds to the desired arrangement of the groove/s (12). Sections of the photosensitive layer (4) are selected by the exposure pattern (8) and are removed by means of photochemical development. An etching agent is inserted into the borehole (1) in order to etch the borehole sections which are not covered by the photosensitive layer (4). The remaining sections of the photosensitive layer (4) are removed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0050665A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0050665 A1 20000831; EP 1080249 A1 20010307; EP 1080249 B1 20030903

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070224

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060224

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060224

2005-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE