Global patent index - EP 1080267 A1

EP 1080267 A1 2001-03-07 - METHOD FOR CALENDERING A LINE OF A PRODUCT WITH A VERTICAL MULTI-ROLL CALENDER, AND CORRESPONDING CALENDER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CALENDERING A LINE OF A PRODUCT WITH A VERTICAL MULTI-ROLL CALENDER, AND CORRESPONDING CALENDER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM KALANDRIEREN EINER WARENBAHN MIT EINEM VERTIKALEN MEHRWALZEN-KALANDER UND EIN KALANDER HIERZU

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CALANDRAGE D'UNE BANDE DE PAPIER AVEC UNE CALANDRE VERTICALE A PLUSIEURS ROULEAUX ET CALANDRE CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1080267 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919260 A

Priority

  • DE 19820089 A
  • EP 9902675 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19820089A1] The invention relates to a method for calendering a line of a product with a vertical multi-roll calender (1). According to said method, several intermediate rolls (4, 5, 6) are situated between a top bend-controlled roll (2) and a bottom bend-controlled roll (3). This roll assembly forms nips (N), with a top and bottom nip, the line passing through said nips. The roll assembly also determines line loads in these nips. The line loads of the nips can be modified by introducing deformation forces through the roll pins (7, 8, 9) of the intermediate rolls. In order to adapt the line loads in the nips to the line to be calendered, the deformation forces introduced through the roll pins of the intermediate rolls are selected with the aim of ensuring that the intermediate rolls receive essentially the same bend for exerting load pressures or relief pressures. The degree of bend is regulated in accordance with a determined modification of the line load differential between the top and bottom nip determined by the rolls. The bend-controlled rolls are then adjusted to suit this bend.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/004 (2013.01); D21G 1/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957369A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19820089 A1 19991118; DE 19820089 C2 20000615; EP 1080267 A1 20010307; EP 1080267 B1 20040303; WO 9957369 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130421

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080421

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FI GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001010

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FI GB IT