Global Patent Index - EP 1080269 A1

EP 1080269 A1 2001-03-07 - SECURITY PAPER HAVING EMBEDDED SECURITY FEATURE AND METHOD OF PREPARING SAME

Title (en)

SECURITY PAPER HAVING EMBEDDED SECURITY FEATURE AND METHOD OF PREPARING SAME

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSPAPIER MIT DARIN EINGEBETTETEM SICHERHEITSELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PAPIER DE SECURITE INTEGRANT UN DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DUDIT PAPIER

Publication

EP 1080269 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906556 A

Priority

  • KR 9900088 W
  • KR 19980013616 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954550A1] A security paper having an embedded security feature in the form of a figure, character or pattern is prepared by a method which comprises, inserting a polyolefin film bearing a print ink layer of the security feature between two sheets of wet paper; pressing the sheets together; and heating the pressed sheets at a temperature above the melting point of the polyolefin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/40 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01); D21H 21/42 (2006.01); D21H 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/42 (2013.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); D21H 27/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954550 A1 19991028; CN 1137309 C 20040204; CN 1296539 A 20010523; DE 69934979 D1 20070315; DE 69934979 T2 20070614; EP 1080269 A1 20010307; EP 1080269 B1 20070124; ES 2277428 T3 20070701; RU 2000128715 A 20040320; RU 2188267 C2 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2277428 T3

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69934979 P 20070315

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2007-01-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB