Global Patent Index - EP 1080270 A1

EP 1080270 A1 2001-03-07 - A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PAPER

Title (en)

A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PAPER

Title (de)

EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPIER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1080270 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99945723 A

Priority

  • EP 99945723 A
  • EP 98850061 A
  • SE 9900574 W
  • US 8278498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954551A1] A process for the production of paper in which cellulosic fibres are treated with microparticles comprising shell-formed carbon allotrope particles, paper obtainable from this process, and a drainage or retention agent comprising at least partially hydrophilic, anionic mircroparticles comprising shell-formed carbon allotrope particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 21/54 (2006.01); D21H 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 17/06 (2013.01); D21H 21/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954551A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954551 A1 19991028; AU 4297699 A 19991108; DE 69921989 T2 20051124; EP 1080270 A1 20010307; EP 1080270 B1 20041117; ES 2229765 T3 20050416

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090409

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090408

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090408

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090408

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090408

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229765 T3

2005-03-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921989 P 20041223

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIKKAR, REIN

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PERSSON, MICHAEL

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NORELL, MARIA

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030904

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE