Global Patent Index - EP 1080272 B1

EP 1080272 B1 2003-06-18 - A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PAPER

Title (en)

A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPIER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1080272 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927016 A

Priority

  • EP 99927016 A
  • EP 98850067 A
  • SE 9900677 W
  • US 8325398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953680A1] The invention relates to a process for the production of paper from a suspension containing cellulosic fibres, and optional fillers, which comprises adding to the suspension a drainage and/or retention aid comprising a cationic organic polymer, forming and dewatering the suspension on a wire, wherein the cationic organic polymer has an aromatic group and the suspension which is dewatered on the wire has a conductivity of at least 2.0 mS/cm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/34 (2006.01); C08F 220/56 (2006.01); D21F 1/66 (2006.01); D21H 11/00 (2006.01); D21H 17/24 (2006.01); D21H 17/28 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 17/32 (2006.01); D21H 17/44 (2006.01); D21H 17/45 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01); D21H 17/68 (2006.01); D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 23/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/04 (2006.01); D21H 23/08 (2006.01); D21H 23/14 (2006.01); C08F 20/56 (2006.01); D21H 11/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/01 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/08 (2013.01); D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 11/14 (2013.01); D21H 17/01 (2013.01); D21H 17/24 (2013.01); D21H 17/28 (2013.01); D21H 17/32 (2013.01); D21H 17/375 (2013.01); D21H 17/455 (2013.01); D21H 17/68 (2013.01); D21H 23/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953680 A1 19991103; AT 243281 T 20030715; AT 243282 T 20030715; AT 257530 T 20040115; AU 4301499 A 19991116; AU 4401599 A 19991116; AU 4401699 A 19991116; AU 747089 B2 20020509; AU 748735 B2 20020613; AU 750335 B2 20020718; BR 9909945 A 20001226; BR 9909945 B1 20090811; BR 9909946 A 20010306; BR 9909946 B1 20091201; BR 9909947 A 20001226; CA 2329027 A1 19991104; CA 2329027 C 20050215; CA 2329028 A1 19991104; CA 2329028 C 20051122; CA 2329191 A1 19991104; CA 2329191 C 20060627; CN 1139691 C 20040225; CN 1155754 C 20040630; CN 1205386 C 20050608; CN 1298466 A 20010606; CN 1299425 A 20010613; CN 1300332 A 20010620; CZ 20003937 A3 20011212; CZ 20003938 A3 20010711; CZ 20003939 A3 20011212; CZ 301092 B6 20091104; CZ 301693 B6 20100526; DE 69908938 T2 20031218; DE 69908939 T2 20040513; DE 69914078 T2 20041014; DK 1080271 T3 20030922; DK 1080272 T3 20031006; DK 1084295 T3 20040426; EP 1080271 A1 20010307; EP 1080271 B1 20030618; EP 1080272 A1 20010307; EP 1080272 B1 20030618; EP 1084295 A2 20010321; EP 1084295 B1 20040107; ES 2196815 T3 20031216; ES 2201725 T3 20040316; ES 2211166 T3 20040701; ID 27307 A 20010322; ID 27490 A 20010412; ID 27899 A 20010503; JP 2002513102 A 20020508; JP 2002513103 A 20020508; JP 2002513104 A 20020508; JP 3890194 B2 20070307; JP 4307721 B2 20090805; NZ 507604 A 20030926; NZ 507605 A 20030131; NZ 507606 A 20030725; PL 200673 B1 20090130; PL 200811 B1 20090227; PL 201054 B1 20090331; PL 344040 A1 20010924; PL 344053 A1 20010924; PL 344079 A1 20010924; PT 1080271 E 20031031; PT 1080272 E 20031031; PT 1084295 E 20040430; RU 2000129670 A 20040327; RU 2185470 C1 20020720; RU 2194106 C2 20021210; RU 2194818 C2 20021220; WO 9955962 A2 19991104; WO 9955962 A3 19991216; WO 9955964 A1 19991104; WO 9955965 A1 19991104; ZA 200005550 B 20010511; ZA 200005551 B 20010511; ZA 200005552 B 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL CHEMICALS INTERNATIONAL B.V., NL

- Document: AT 243282 T

- Effective date: 20180117

2018-02-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20180111 AND 20180117

2018-01-26 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL CHEMICALS INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20180122

2018-01-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908939

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2017-10-18 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL CHEMICALS INTERNATIONAL B.V.; NL

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170403

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170406

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-11-19 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Free text: AKZO NOBEL N.V.#VELPERWEG 76, POSTBUS 9300#6800 SB ARNHEM (NL) -TRANSFER TO- AKZO NOBEL N.V.#VELPERWEG 76, POSTBUS 9300#6800 SB ARNHEM (NL)

2006-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050623

2006-02-01 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050623

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RAISIO CHEMICALS LTD.

2004-05-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RAISIO CHEMICALS LTD.TIEDTKE-BUEHLING-KINNE & P

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201725 T3

2003-10-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908939 P 20030724

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21H 23/08 A, 7D 21H 21/10 J, 7D 21H 17:20 J

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21H 23/08 A, 7D 21H 21/10 J, 7D 21H 17:20 J

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE