Global Patent Index - EP 1080274 A1

EP 1080274 A1 2001-03-07 - ARTIFICIAL LAWN WITH HOLLOW GRASS BLADES

Title (en)

ARTIFICIAL LAWN WITH HOLLOW GRASS BLADES

Title (de)

KUNSTRASEN MIT HOHLEN HALMEN

Title (fr)

PELOUSE SYNTHETIQUE A TIGES CREUSES

Publication

EP 1080274 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924955 A

Priority

  • DE 19822542 A
  • EP 9903276 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822542C1] The invention relates to an artificial lawn able to absorb and store greater quantities of water. The stored water is released only when the lawn is walked upon and is available to improve its sliding properties. The artificial lawn comprises blades (4) which are at least partly hollow and can consist of small U-shaped tubes (7). Said small tubes (7) can further have openings (9, 11) in their lateral walls so as possibly to be able to absorb water also from the support layer (2) or from a water-storing layer (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/00 (2006.01); E01C 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/08 (2013.01); Y10S 273/13 (2013.01); Y10T 428/139 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960213A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822542 C1 19991202; EP 1080274 A1 20010307; EP 1080274 B1 20030910; ES 2207945 T3 20040601; JP 2002515557 A 20020528; JP 4084538 B2 20080430; PT 1080274 E 20040227; US 6495236 B1 20021217; WO 9960213 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170512

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170512

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171206

2018-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171113

2018-02-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170512

2018-01-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906962

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906962

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906962

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207945 T3

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030405017

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906962 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEN CATE THIOLON B.V.

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001216

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT