Global Patent Index - EP 1080281 B1

EP 1080281 B1 2002-09-25 - GRAVEL STOP

Title (en)

GRAVEL STOP

Title (de)

DACHFANGLEISTE

Title (fr)

GARDE-GRAVIER

Publication

EP 1080281 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939768 A

Priority

  • DE 29809975 U
  • EP 9903406 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960226A1] The invention relates to a gravel stop comprising a first lateral side (3) and a second lateral side (5) which sides are positioned at an angle to each other and joined to each other. At least one of the sides is configured as a connecting side (3) and can be joined to a roof (31) and the other side serves as the stop side (5). The gravel stop (1) is made of a composite material. The invention is notably characterized in that the composite material consists of a metal sheet (25) made of a non-corroding material which on one side is coated with a plastic film (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/04 (2006.01); E04D 13/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0459 (2013.01); E04D 13/15 (2013.01); E04D 2013/0472 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809975 U1 19981029; AT 224987 T 20021015; CZ 20004298 A3 20010815; CZ 298630 B6 20071128; EP 1080281 A1 20010307; EP 1080281 B1 20020925; HU 0101815 A2 20011028; HU 0101815 A3 20030128; HU 226049 B1 20080428; PL 204752 B1 20100226; PL 344487 A1 20011105; SK 17552000 A3 20020107; SK 285630 B6 20070503; WO 9960226 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170518

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170518

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170518

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170518

2018-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224987 T

- Effective date: 20170518

2018-01-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080518

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902851 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224987 T 20021015

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAYER, MARKUS

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIMMERMANN, MICHAEL

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOCH, HANS-JUERGEN

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL