Global Patent Index - EP 1080284 A1

EP 1080284 A1 2001-03-07 - POOL CLEANER

Title (en)

POOL CLEANER

Title (de)

SCHWIMMBECKENREINIGER

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE POUR PISCINES

Publication

EP 1080284 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99923211 A

Priority

  • US 9911035 W
  • ZA 9804346 A
  • ZA 9809806 A
  • ZA 9902896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961727A1] A push side pool cleaner (1) has a spheroidal overall shape, within this shape two outer segments (9, 10) serve as wheels and a central zone (8) carries a suction passage (33) and a debris collector (32) also located entirely within the overall shape. The wheels are driven directly by water jets (44, 45) without any gears or other transmission. A flow splitter is provided in the cleaner (1) to divide push side water flow between the jets (44, 45) which drive the wheels and jets (43) which provide impulsion to the suction passage (33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/1654 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961727A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961727 A1 19991202; AU 4003599 A 19991213; AU 748873 B2 20020613; BR 9910659 A 20010130; CA 2330382 A1 19991202; CA 2330382 C 20070731; DE 69919159 D1 20040909; DE 69919159 T2 20050811; EP 1080284 A1 20010307; EP 1080284 B1 20040804; ES 2226386 T3 20050316

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130519

2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69919159

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130519

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130519

2013-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZODIAC POOL CARE EUROPE

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226386 T3

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919159 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZODIAC POOL CARE EUROPE

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT