Global Patent Index - EP 1080286 A1

EP 1080286 A1 2001-03-07 - ELECTRONIC LOCK WITH MECHANICAL CLUTCH

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC LOCK WITH MECHANICAL CLUTCH

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES SCHLOSS MIT MECHANISCHER KUPPLUNG

Title (fr)

SERRURE ELECTRONIQUE A EMBRAYAGE MECANIQUE

Publication

EP 1080286 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920916 A

Priority

  • FR 9901224 W
  • FR 9806642 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779168A1] The invention concerns an electronic barrel comprising a barrel body (12, 14) and a rotary-lock key bit (10), the barrel body comprising at least a rotor (32, 34) having a common axis with the body and the rotary-lock key bit and freely rotating in said body, a clutch part (40, 42) coupled in rotation with the rotor and comprising meshing means co-operating with means matching the key bit so as to drive in rotation said key bit by the rotor by the action of a rotating torque of the key (8), and locking means for preventing the clutch part (40, 42) from being translated when there is no recognition of an identification code transmitted between the key and the barrel, the locking means are further mounted integral in the rotary-lock key bit and the rotor is mobile in translation for thrusting the clutch part towards the key bit when said identification code is recognised.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/10; E05B 17/04; E05B 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 9/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/042 (2013.01); E05B 47/0642 (2013.01); E05B 47/068 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0031 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7062 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7079 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7136 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961728A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779168 A1 19991203; FR 2779168 B1 20010126; AT 221609 T 20020815; AU 3831499 A 19991213; BG 104985 A 20011031; BR 9910713 A 20010130; CA 2333140 A1 19991202; CN 1265071 C 20060719; CN 1307662 A 20010808; DE 69902380 D1 20020905; DE 69902380 T2 20030424; EP 1080286 A1 20010307; EP 1080286 B1 20020731; ES 2182520 T3 20030301; HK 1038387 A1 20070202; HU 0102645 A2 20011128; HU 0102645 A3 20020228; HU 225755 B1 20070828; IL 139698 D0 20020210; JP 2002516936 A 20020611; JP 4526706 B2 20100818; PL 192770 B1 20061229; PL 344473 A1 20011105; TR 200003463 T2 20010420; US 6334347 B1 20020101; WO 9961728 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160506

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160506

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ACSYS IP HOLDING, LB

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130422

2013-06-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130422

2013-04-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AL AZEM IT HOLDINGS, LB

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ACSYS IP HOLDING, LB

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-01-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-01-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AL AZEM IT HOLDINGS INC., LC

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20121207

2008-08-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2008-05-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DENY FONTAINE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2005-12-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-03-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1080286E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182520

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-01-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-11-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-05

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 221609

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE