Global patent index - EP 1080288 A1

EP 1080288 A1 2001-03-07 - REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

FERNBEDIENUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TELECOMMANDE POUR VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1080288 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923498 A

Priority

  • DE 19823731 A
  • EP 9902917 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823731A1] The invention relates to a remote control device for motor vehicles (1), comprising a transmitter (4) for a wireless transmitted enabling signal, which is activated only when the user has been recognized as an authorized user and which has an identification device (7) recognizing said authorization and which is assembled in one single constructional unit along with the transmitter. The identification device records personal and individual characteristics of the user.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); B60R 25/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00563 (2013.01); G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00095 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961731A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823731 A1 19991202; EP 1080288 A1 20010307; EP 1080288 B1 20040908; ES 2226387 T3 20050316; JP 2002516937 A 20020611; JP 4436969 B2 20100324; US 6924729 B1 20050802; WO 9961731 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070429

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070429

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070429

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226387

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030204

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT