Global Patent Index - EP 1080304 A1

EP 1080304 A1 2001-03-07 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1080304 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929215 A

Priority

  • DE 0000820 W
  • DE 19912665 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19912665A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve (1), more particularly, an injection valve in fuel injection systems of internal combustion engines, having a fuel inlet (4) for supplying fuel, a piezoelectric or magnetorestrictive actuator (13) which is sealed against the fuel by a sealing (18, 19) and a valve closing body (6) which can be actuated by the actuator (13) by means of a valve needle (5). The valve closing body (6) engages with a valve seat surface (8) to form a sealed seat. The sealing (18, 19) comprises a sealing plate (18) that is arranged between the fuel inlet (4) and the actuator (13) and that is provided with a fuel channel (21') in order to supply the fuel from the fuel inlet (4) in the direction towards the sealed seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F16K 31/02 (2006.01); H01L 41/09 (2006.01); H01L 41/12 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057050A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912665 A1 20000921; CN 1145745 C 20040414; CN 1297513 A 20010530; EP 1080304 A1 20010307; EP 1080304 B1 20041013; JP 2002540342 A 20021126; RU 2244151 C2 20050110; US 6467460 B1 20021022; WO 0057050 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008203

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-11-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111007

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20041013

2005-03-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050202

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008203 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI