Global patent index - EP 1080305 A1

EP 1080305 A1 2001-03-07 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1080305 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957921 A

Priority

  • DE 9903357 W
  • DE 19912666 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19912666A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve (1), especially an injection valve for fuel injection systems, comprising a fuel admission tube (4) for supplying fuel, a piezoelectric or magnetostrictive actuator (13), which is sealed against the fuel by a sealing (14, 16, 20, 21), in addition to a valve closing body (6) actuated by the actuator (13) by means of a valve needle (5) and cooperating with a valve seat surface (8) to form a sealing seat. The sealing (14, 16, 20, 21) has a sealing plate (14) on the admission side, which is mounted between the fuel admission pipe (4) and the actuator (13) and an actuator casing (20) that is elastically deformable in longitudinal direction and that is connected to the sealing plate (14) on the admission side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F16K 31/02 (2006.01); H01L 41/09 (2006.01); H01L 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 63/0057 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057049A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912666 A1 20000921; EP 1080305 A1 20010307; EP 1080305 B1 20020731; EP 1080305 B2 20120425; JP 2002540341 A 20021126; JP 4469506 B2 20100526; US 2003015601 A1 20030123; US 6435430 B1 20020820; US 6889913 B2 20050510; WO 0057049 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-14 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 59902197

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-04-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1080305E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902197

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-05

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE