Global Patent Index - EP 1080308 A1

EP 1080308 A1 2001-03-07 - FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP AND TWO PRESSURE ACCUMULATORS

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP AND TWO PRESSURE ACCUMULATORS

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE, MIT EINER HOCHDRUCKPUMPE UND ZWEI DRUCKSPEICHERN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, COMPRENANT UNE POMPE HAUTE PRESSION ET DEUX ACCUMULATEURS DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1080308 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907451 A

Priority

  • DE 0000213 W
  • DE 19910971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19910971A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine comprising at least two different high system pressures, whereby a first pressure accumulator (4) which is supplied by a high-pressure pump (3) is provided for the higher system pressure and a second pressure accumulator (6) is provided for the lower system pressure. At least the first pressure accumulator (4) can be connected via a line to the injectors (10) of the individual cylinders of the internal combustion engine in order to effect a fuel injection. The pressure level of the high-pressure pump (3) is greater than the higher system pressure and the first pressure accumulator (4) has a first pressure control valve (5) leading to the second pressure accumulator (6), and the second pressure accumulator (6) comprises a second pressure control valve (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/02; F02M 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2041/3881 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055498A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910971 A1 20000921; EP 1080308 A1 20010307; EP 1080308 B1 20040506; JP 2002539374 A 20021119; US 6598590 B1 20030729; WO 0055498 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006309

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE