Global Patent Index - EP 1080325 A1

EP 1080325 A1 2001-03-07 - FLUIDIZED BED COMBUSTION SYSTEM WITH STEAM GENERATION

Title (en)

FLUIDIZED BED COMBUSTION SYSTEM WITH STEAM GENERATION

Title (de)

WIRBELSCHICHT-FEUERUNGSSYSTEM MIT DAMPFERZEUGUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMBUSTION EN LIT FLUIDISE AVEC PRODUCTION DE VAPEUR

Publication

EP 1080325 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952112 A

Priority

  • DE 19822304 A
  • DE 19834881 A
  • EP 9903376 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960305A1] The combustion system for an industrial installation operates at least partly with solid fuel. The installation has a heat exchange chamber (1) having an inner height of at least 10 m. The chamber has four vertical outer walls encompassing an approximately rectangular area in a horizontal cross-section. A turbulent combustion chamber (2, 3) having an inner height of 10 to 60 m is arranged in front of a first outer wall (1a) of the heat exchange chamber (1) and a second outer wall (1c) located opposite to the first outer wall. Each turbulent combustion chamber (2, 3) has an inner height of 10 to 60 m and lines for supplying fuel and combustion air. At least one separator (5, 7) for separating solids from a gas flow is connected to the top section of each turbulent combustion chamber (2, 3), said separator having a gas discharge line (9) that is connected to the top section of the heat exchange chamber (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/30 (2006.01); F22B 1/02 (2006.01); F22B 31/00 (2006.01); F23C 10/00 (2006.01); F23C 10/02 (2006.01); F23C 10/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 10/005 (2013.01); F22B 31/0084 (2013.01); F23C 10/002 (2013.01); F23C 10/10 (2013.01); F23C 2206/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960305A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960305 A1 19991125; AT 208877 T 20011115; AU 4262999 A 19991206; AU 746774 B2 20020502; BR 9910604 A 20010116; CA 2332516 A1 19991125; CA 2332516 C 20050712; CO 4870738 A1 19991227; CZ 20004284 A3 20011114; CZ 290860 B6 20021016; DE 19834881 A1 20000309; DE 19834881 B4 20070621; DE 59900444 D1 20011220; DK 1080325 T3 20020211; EA 002507 B1 20020627; EA 200001196 A1 20010625; EE 04288 B1 20040415; EE 200000679 A 20020415; EP 1080325 A1 20010307; EP 1080325 B1 20011114; ES 2168022 T3 20020516; HU 0101897 A2 20011128; HU 0101897 A3 20011228; HU 225365 B1 20061028; JP 2002515580 A 20020528; MA 24861 A1 19991231; PL 192416 B1 20061031; PL 344241 A1 20011008; RO 119163 B1 20040430; SI 20342 A 20010228; TR 200003392 T2 20010221; US 6481385 B1 20021119

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-26 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-01-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121210

2012-09-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH., DE

- Document: AT 208877 T

- Effective date: 20120717

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AE & E LENTJES GMBH, 40880 RATINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59900444

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900444

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BECKER & MUELLER, DE

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-06-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900444

- Representative's name: BECKER UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2011-07-11 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: AE & E LENTJES GMBH

- Effective date: 20110629

2011-06-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-04-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DOOSAN LENTJES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LENTJES GMBH, 40880 RATINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59900444

- Effective date: 20110207

2008-01-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-01-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-05-17 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168022 T3

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-03-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OUTOKUMPU OYJ

2002-02-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-02-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900444 20011220

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-11-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208877 T 20011115

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE