Global Patent Index - EP 1080337 A1

EP 1080337 A1 2001-03-07 - COMPOSITE ARMOR PLATE

Title (en)

COMPOSITE ARMOR PLATE

Title (de)

VERBUNDPANZERPLATTE

Title (fr)

BLINDAGE COMPOSITE

Publication

EP 1080337 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921114 A

Priority

  • IL 9900260 W
  • IL 12454398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0959321A1] The invention provides a composite armor plate (10; 22) for absorbing and dissipating kinetic energy from high velocity projectiles, the plate comprising a single internal layer of pellets (14; 24) which are directly bound and retained in plate form by a solidified material (16) such that the pellets are bound in a plurality of adjacent rows, characterized in that the pellets (14; 24) have a specific gravity of at least 2 and are made of a material selected from the group consisting of glass, sintered refractory material, ceramic material which does not contain aluminium oxide and ceramic material having an aluminium oxide content of not more than 80%, the majority of the pellets each have at least one axis of at least 3 mm length and are bound by the solidified material in the single internal layer of adjacent rows such that each of a majority of the pellets is in direct contact with at least 4 adjacent pellets in the same layer to provide mutual lateral confinement therebetween, the pellets each have a substantially regular geometric form and the solidified material and the plate are elastic. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/0414 (2013.01); F41H 5/0492 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • US 3523057 A 19700804 - BUCK NORMAN R
  • EP 0699887 A2 19960306 - A F H INVESTMENT LTD [VG]
  • US 4061815 A 19771206 - POOLE JR ROBERT E J
  • LAIBLE R.C.: "BALLISTIC MATERIALS AND PENETRATION MECHANICS", 1980, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY, article LAIBLE R.C.: "CERAMIC COMPOSITE ARMOR", pages: 135 - 140, XP002954274
  • Brochure from Diamonite Products USA 'Technical Ceramics'
  • ALCOA INDUSTRIAL CHEMICALS Product Data: 'Highly Pre Sintered Alpha Alumina Especially Useful as Inert Catalyst Bed Supports', Pages 1 - 3
  • KO F.K.: "BEHAVIOR OF GRADIENT DESIGNED COMPOSITE UNDER BALLISTIC IMPACT", PROCEEDINGS OF ICCM-11, 14 July 1997 (1997-07-14) - 18 July 1997 (1997-07-18), GOLD COAST, AUSTRALIA, pages 1 - 10, XP002976629
  • See also references of WO 9960327A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0959321 A1 19991124; AT 399302 T 20080715; AU 3845499 A 19991206; CA 2331529 A1 19991125; CA 2331529 C 20060124; DE 69938965 D1 20080807; EP 1080337 A1 20010307; EP 1080337 B1 20080625; EP 1080337 B2 20150218; IL 124543 A 20010826; IL 124543 D0 19981206; WO 9960327 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-26 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69938965

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-02-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2015-02-18 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69938965

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080625

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090516

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080926

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090516

2010-03-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RAFAEL-ARMAMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY LTD.

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PLASAN-SASA - LIMITED PARTNERSHIP OF KIBBUTZ SASA

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081006

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080925

2009-01-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080625

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080625

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080625

2008-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938965 P 20080807

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COHEN, MICHAEL

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COHEN, MICHAEL

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE