Global Patent Index - EP 1080377 A1

EP 1080377 A1 2001-03-07 - COMPUTER AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE TOMOGRAPHY DATA (TURBO-PEPSI)

Title (en)

COMPUTER AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE TOMOGRAPHY DATA (TURBO-PEPSI)

Title (de)

COMPUTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSWERTEN VON DATEN AUS DER KERNMAGNETISCHEN RESONANZTOMOGRAPHIE (TURBO-PEPSI)

Title (fr)

ORDINATEUR ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES DONNEES D'UN SCANNER A RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE NUCLEAIRE (TURBO- PEPSI)

Publication

EP 1080377 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926256 A

Priority

  • DE 9901148 W
  • DE 19817228 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817228C1] The computer is supplied with nuclear magnetic resonance tomography data corresponding to at least 2 different relaxation signals for the examined sample and provides a function corresponding to the difference between these signals. The quotient of the difference signal and a noise signal is determined over an interval which is less than the time sequence of the function, with a processor approximating the function values over this interval. Also included are Independent claims for the following : (a) a nuclear magnetic resonance tomograph; (b) a method for evaluating data provided by nuclear magnetic resonance tomography

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 33/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/54 (2006.01); A61B 5/055 (2006.01); G01R 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954748A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817228 C1 19990909; EP 1080377 A1 20010307; JP 2002512099 A 20020423; WO 9954748 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POSSE, STEFAN

2004-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KISELEV, VALERI

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031107

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE