Global patent index - EP 1080393 A1

EP 1080393 A1 2001-03-07 - METHOD FOR MEASURING THE POSITION OF STRUCTURES ON A SURFACE OF A MASK

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MEASURING THE POSITION OF STRUCTURES ON A SURFACE OF A MASK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER LAGE VON STRUKTUREN AUF EINER MASKENOBERFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA MESURE DE LA POSITION DE STRUCTURES SUR LA SURFACE D'UN MASQUE

Publication

EP 1080393 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917765 A

Priority

  • DE 9900566 W
  • DE 19817714 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6226087B1] A method is provided for measuring structures on a mask surface in which the mask is supported on a measuring stage that is interferometrically measurably displaceable perpendicularly to an optical axis of an image-measuring system. A mask coordinate system associated with the mask is aligned using alignment marks relative to a measuring device coordinate system. With set positions of the structures in the mask coordinate system being specified in advance, the positions of at least two external edges of the mask in the mask coordinate system that are perpendicular to one another are measured in addition to the actual positions of the structures in the mask coordinate system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 1/00; G03F 7/20; G03F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/08 (2006.01); G06T 7/60 (2006.01); G01B 11/03 (2006.01); G03F 1/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01); G03F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 9/7007 (2013.01); G03F 7/70716 (2013.01); G06T 7/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954785A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6226087 B1 20010501; DE 19817714 A1 19991104; DE 19817714 B4 20061228; DE 19817714 C5 20110630; EP 1080393 A1 20010307; JP 2002512384 A 20020423; JP 3488428 B2 20040119; TW 385359 B 20000321; WO 9954785 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status

2009-03-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20090130

2009-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G06T 7/60 20060101AFI20081203BHEP

2009-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G03F 7/20 20060101ALI20081203BHEP

2009-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G03F 9/00 20060101ALI20081203BHEP

2009-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G03F 1/00 20060101ALI20081203BHEP

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VISTEC SEMICONDUCTOR SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEICA MICROSYSTEMS SEMICONDUCTOR GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB