Global patent index - EP 1080428 A1

EP 1080428 A1 2001-03-07 - A METHOD FOR COMPARATIVE VISUAL RENDERING OF DATA

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR COMPARATIVE VISUAL RENDERING OF DATA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERGLEICHBAREN VISUELLEN DARSTELLEN VON DATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ASSURER UN RENDU VISUEL COMPARATIF DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1080428 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921115 A

Priority

  • IL 9900261 W
  • US 8578198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960491A1] Method for the interactive graphical presentation of multidimensional data to a user. Data is extracted from multidimensional database, in which it is arranged and stored according to predetermined attributes, representing different measures for each dimension. A data processing means having user interface is coupled to the database, so as to extract data for presentation. Upon receiving a request for presentation from the user, data which is relevant to the request is extracted from the corresponding dimension(s) in the database, processed by the processing means and displayed in two or more separate windows linked to each other. Each window corresponds to a single dimension and contains colored bars or other means of representation for comparative presentation of the data related to this single dimension.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30592 (2013.01); G06F 17/30395 (2013.01); G06F 17/30554 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960491A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960491 A1 19991125; AU 3845599 A 19991206; CA 2332579 A1 19991125; CA 2332579 C 20081202; EP 1080428 A1 20010307; IL 139503 D0 20020725; JP 2002516434 A 20020604; JP 4567191 B2 20101020

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-11-15 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R003

2009-12-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICROSOFT CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071214

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE