Global Patent Index - EP 1080443 A1

EP 1080443 A1 2001-03-07 - IMPROVED DARK FRAME SUBTRACTION

Title (en)

IMPROVED DARK FRAME SUBTRACTION

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE DUNKELBILDSUBTRAKTION

Title (fr)

SOUSTRACTION AMELIOREE D'IMAGE SOMBRE

Publication

EP 1080443 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99923073 A

Priority

  • US 9910699 W
  • US 8669798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962023A1] A method of adjusting a portion of a dark frame (116) in accordance with compensation values related to dark reference pixels of a picture frame to obtain an adjusted dark frame portion, and then subtracting the adjusted dark frame portion from a corresponding picture frame portion. The technique may be used to improve the accuracy of image sensor (617) such as those used in digital cameras or video conferencing cameras by compensating for dark current noise. The technique may be applied to both CMOS image sensor and, in general, to any image sensors requiring dark frame subtraction. The techniques may also be used in conjunction with calibration of image sensors and imaging systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 5/50 (2006.01); H04N 1/407 (2006.01); H04N 5/361 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/361 (2013.01); G06T 5/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962023 A1 19991202; AU 3992599 A 19991213; DE 69919351 D1 20040916; DE 69919351 T2 20050901; EP 1080443 A1 20010307; EP 1080443 A4 20010905; EP 1080443 B1 20040811; JP 2002517112 A 20020611; KR 100415681 B1 20040124; TW 425816 B 20010311; US 6101287 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100514

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100514

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919351 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030930

2001-09-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 9/40 A, 7H 04N 5/217 B

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL