Global patent index - EP 1080461 A1

EP 1080461 A1 2001-03-07 - SIGN

Title (en)

SIGN

Title (de)

ANZEIGETAFEL

Title (fr)

PLAQUE-ENSEIGNE

Publication

EP 1080461 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920566 A

Priority

  • DK 9900271 W
  • DK 70698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960553A1] A sign comprising: a base part (5', 5'') having mounting means (3) for the sign on a carrier face (1), at least one sign plate (10) shaped to engage the base part (5', 5'') and having protruding engagement means (15, 18), at least one locking device (20) for the engagement means (15, 18), said base part (5', 5'') comprising an elongated reception track (6) for the locking device (20), allowing the locking device (20) to be moved from a first position A to a second position B. The locking device (20) has a reception opening (25, 28) for a respective engagement means (15, 18) formed with a first portion (25) which provides a first pull-out resistance on the engagement means (15, 18), and a second portion (28) which provides a second and greater pull-out resistance on the engagement means (15, 18). The locking device (20) provides the first pull-out resistance in the first position A and the second pull-out resistance in the second position B.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960553A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960553 A1 19991125; AU 3810399 A 19991206; EP 1080461 A1 20010307

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOLSCHER, KNUD

2005-07-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SIGN

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE